RI H5177 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Accidents And Accident Reports (would Increase The Penalties And Fines For The Various Motor Vehicle Offenses Involving Leaving The Scene Of An Accident)
Title
An Act Relating To Motor And Other Vehicles - Accidents And Accident Reports (would Increase The Penalties And Fines For The Various Motor Vehicle Offenses Involving Leaving The Scene Of An Accident)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2013) |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5177.pdf |