RI H5164 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows students in public schools to possess and use a topical sunscreen product. Children enrolled in grades K-5 would need a note from a parent or guardian in order to possess sunscreen on school property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health And Safety Of Pupils

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09HouseSigned by Governor
2021-07-07HouseTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2021-06-30SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-28SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2021-06-25SenateScheduled for consideration (06/28/2021)
2021-06-25SenateMeeting postponed (06/30/2021)
2021-06-25SenateScheduled for consideration
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Senate Education
2021-03-09HouseHouse read and passed
2021-03-05HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/09/2021)
2021-02-25HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-02-18HouseScheduled for consideration (02/25/2021)
2021-02-02HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-01-29HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2021)
2021-01-29HouseCommittee transferred to House Health & Human Services
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback