RI H5162 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Commercial Law--general Regulatory Provisions -- Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals (would Add City And Town Owned Manhole Covers And Bridge Placards To The Sale Of Protected Precious Metals)
Title
An Act Relating To Commercial Law--general Regulatory Provisions -- Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals (would Add City And Town Owned Manhole Covers And Bridge Placards To The Sale Of Protected Precious Metals)
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] | Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Maria Cimini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Senate held on desk |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/02/2013) |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (07/02/2013) |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2013) |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-04-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/25/2013) |
2013-02-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2013) |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |