RI H5156 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the current law so that digital breast tomosynthesis (dbt) screenings are available wherever mammograms are conducted and to provide insurance coverage for such screenings.
Title
The Breast Cancer Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee transferred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5156.pdf |