RI H5156 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits the possession of a stun-gun under the same license conditions which apply to possession of a pistol.
Title
Weapons - Stun-guns
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H5156.pdf |