RI H5149 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Exeter town sergeant or designees to conduct division of motor vehicles vehicle identifying number and odometer inspections.
Title
Inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage in concurrence (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2021-06-15 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021) |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/22/2021) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |