RI H5139 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of children, youth and families to report all suspected cases of child sexual abuse to the children's advocacy center.
Title
Abused And Neglected Children
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] |
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2021) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-10 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2021) |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2021) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |