RI H5135 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes licensing procedure for persons seeking to engage in geoengineering activity from DEM to protect health/safety/environment of state.
Title
The Geoengineering Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2021) |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5135.pdf |