RI H5126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires compassion centers to post conspicuous signs warning of the dangers of marijuana when used by pregnant or breastfeeding women.
Title
The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. John Lyle [R] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2019) |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5126.pdf |