RI H5124 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits lobbyists from making any political contributions to any member of the general assembly from January 1 through July 1 in any year, unless the general assembly adjourns for the year prior to July 1.
Title
The Rhode Island Lobbying Reform Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2023) |
2023-03-14 | House | Meeting postponed (03/14/2023) |
2023-03-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H5124.pdf |