RI H5099 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study The Quality Of Life And Create Positive Outcomes For Individuals With Autism In The State Of Rhode Island
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Joint Commission To Study The Quality Of Life And Create Positive Outcomes For Individuals With Autism In The State Of Rhode Island
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-06-18 | Senate | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2013) |
2013-06-12 | House | Senate passed Sub A |
2013-06-11 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/12/2013) |
2013-05-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2013) |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-01-31 | House | House read and passed |
2013-01-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (01/31/2013) |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-01-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2013) |
2013-01-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5099.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H5099A.pdf |