RI H5093 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for specific fines and sanctions to operators of motor vehicles who fail to exercise due care to avoid colliding with a vulnerable road user causing injury, serious injury, or death to the vulnerable road user.
Title
Passing, Use Of Lanes, And Rules Of The Road
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 50 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 9 N: 50 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-15 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2021) |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2021-06-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2021) |
2021-06-02 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/01/2021) |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-03-25 | House | House read and passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/25/2021) |
2021-03-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-03-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/09/2021) |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/02/2021) |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |