RI H5085 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Motor Fuel Tax (creates An Eight (8) Member Special Legislative Study Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Study And Make Recommendations On The Elimination Of The Motor Fuel Tax.)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Motor Fuel Tax (creates An Eight (8) Member Special Legislative Study Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Study And Make Recommendations On The Elimination Of The Motor Fuel Tax.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-03-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2015) |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H5085.pdf |
Roll Call | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/SVotes/votereport.asp?id=7908 |