RI H5075 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the sealing of any district court file, where a resolution of a trespass and eviction complaint results in a verdict for the tenant and no appeal is taken.
Title
Residential Landlord And Tenant Act
Sponsors
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2019) |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5075.pdf |