RI H5066 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the membership of the governor's council on behavioral health from thirty-one (31) to thirty-two (32) members by adding the president of the Hospital Association of Rhode Island or a designee.
Title
Governor's Council On Behavioral Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2021) |
2021-02-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2021) |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee transferred to House Health & Human Services |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5066.pdf |