RI H5055 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires driver's instruction courses and tests to include instruction and information on a driver's responsible conduct during a traffic stop.
Title
Driver Education Requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage of amendment ruling of the chair (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-06-14 | House | House read and passed |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2017) |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/01/2017) |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |