RI H5032 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands certain rights of persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Relating To Behavioral Healthcare, Developmental Disabilities And Hospitals
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-01-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2019) |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5032.pdf |