RI H5030 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-24 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits utility rate increases in excess of two and one-half percent (2.5%) over any twenty-four (24) month period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Powers Of Administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-24HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-01-20HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/24/2017)
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback