RI H5027 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Incorporates SurveyWorks school climate indicators for evaluating the performance of LEAs and individual public schools.
Title
Education Accountability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2021) |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee transferred to House Education |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5027.pdf |