RI H5012 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates minimum staffing levels, standards for quality care for nursing homes and their residents, and provides wage increases subject to the rate of inflation.
Title
Nursing Home Staffing And Quality Care Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 7 N: 54 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 13 N: 45 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 7 N: 54 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 13 N: 45 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-04 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2021) |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2021-05-04 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-04-28 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2021) |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2021) |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |