RI H5012 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/13/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/13/2019)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends towing storage act and clarifies towing and storage issues.
Title
Miscellaneous Rules--motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (02/13/2019) |
2019-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (01/30/2019) |
2019-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5012.pdf |