RI H5006 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for abortion coverage in the Medicaid program and repeal the abortion coverage exclusion for state employee insurance plans.
Title
Health Care For Children And Pregnant Women -- Equality In Abortion Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-05-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2023) |
2023-04-27 | House | House read and passed |
2023-04-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/27/2023) |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/20/2023) |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2023) |
2023-01-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |