RI H5002 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-12 - Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Resolution Adopting The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2021 And 2022

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Resolution Adopting The Rules Of The House Of Representatives For The Years 2021 And 2022

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-12HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2021)
2021-01-14HouseCommittee heard and continued
2021-01-12HouseScheduled for hearing (01/14/2021)
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Rules Committee

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback