PA SR54 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-21 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution urging the President and the Congress of the United States to consider imposing tariffs on imported anthracite coal that adversely affect American jobs.
Title
Urging the President and the Congress of the United States to consider imposing tariffs on imported anthracite coal that adversely affect American jobs.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. John Gordner [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SR 54 PN 651, MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-21 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Adopted (46-0) |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |