PA SR417 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on October 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-23 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Resolution directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to conduct a study on secondary school start time in this Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Joint State Government Commission to establish an advisory committee to conduct a study on secondary school start time in this Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-23SenateTransmitted as directed
2018-10-17SenateAdopted
2018-09-25SenateReported as amended
2018-09-11SenateCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1972
2018-09-10SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback