PA SR414 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Transmitted as directed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study of alternative methods of authorizing charter schools and regional charter schools.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study of alternative methods of authorizing charter schools and regional charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-27 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted as directed |
2014-06-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |