PA SR34 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-21 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-21 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution establishing a Global Education Task Force.
Title
A Concurrent Resolution establishing a Global Education Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-21 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |