PA SR105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study of the statutory cap on the Pennsylvania State Police complement and issue a report of its findings and recommendations to the Senate.
Title
Directing the Legislative Budget and Finance Committee to conduct a study of the statutory cap on the Pennsylvania State Police complement and issue a report of its findings and recommendations to the Senate.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |