PA SB983 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for person with disability plate and placard.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for person with disability plate and placard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 983 PN 1852, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: SB 983 PN 1852, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Floor: SB 983 PN 1219, 2015 A7722, KINSEY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 983 PN 1219, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: SB 983 PN 1852, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Floor: SB 983 PN 1219, 2015 A7722, KINSEY (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 983 PN 1219, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Act No. 55 |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (49-0) |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-03-24 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-03-22 | House | In the House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-09-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-09-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |