PA SB952 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-11 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-11 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey a certain tract of land and improvements thereon in Lower Oxford Township, Chester County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey a certain tract of land and improvements thereon in Lower Oxford Township, Chester County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 952 PN 1176, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-11 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-12-10 | House | In the House |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-12-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-11-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |