PA SB921 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-03 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-03 - Act No. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 1983 (P.L.306, No.84), known as the Board of Vehicles Act, providing for the definitions of "dual" or "dualing" and "line-make"; further providing for mediation and arbitration, for unlawful acts by manufacturers or distributors and for manufacturer or distributor repurchase of inventory and equipment.
Title
Providing for the definitions of "dual" or "dualing" and "line-make"; further providing for mediation and arbitration, for unlawful acts by manufacturers or distributors and for manufacturer or distributor repurchase of inventory and equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-26 - Senate - SB 921 PN 1266, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - House - SB 921 PN 1266, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - SB 921 PN 1139, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-05 - House - SB 921 PN 1266, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - SB 921 PN 1139, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-03 | Act No. 41 | |
2009-09-03 | Approved by the Governor | |
2009-08-27 | Presented to the Governor | |
2009-08-27 | Signed in House | |
2009-08-26 | Signed in Senate | |
2009-08-26 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2009-08-19 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2009-08-10 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2009-08-05 | In the Senate | |
2009-08-05 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-08-04 | Second consideration | |
2009-08-04 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-08 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-08 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-07 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-07 | First consideration | |
2009-07-07 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-26 | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2009-06-23 | In the House | |
2009-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-16 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |