PA SB900 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the transfer of title for certain Project 70 lands owned by Lehigh County to Whitehall Township, Lehigh County.
Title
Authorizing the transfer of title for certain Project 70 lands owned by Lehigh County to Whitehall Township, Lehigh County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 900 PN 1201, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-10-24 | House | In the House |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-10-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-10-17 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |