PA SB888 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Act No. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Act No. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating the bridges on Route 28 in the Boroughs of Etna and Sharpsburg, Allegheny County, as the Chief Warrant Officer Michael J. Novosel Memorial Bridges; and making a related repeal.
Title
Designating the bridges on Route 28 in the Boroughs of Etna and Sharpsburg, Allegheny County, as the Chief Warrant Officer Michael J. Novosel Memorial Bridges; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Alloway [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Andrew Dinniman [D] | Sen. Jim Ferlo [D] |
Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] | Sen. Stewart Greenleaf [R] | Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] | Sen. Michael O'Pake [D] |
Sen. Jane Orie [R] | Sen. John Pippy [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Joseph Scarnati [R] |
Sen. Mike Stack [D] | Sen. Barry Stout [D] | Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Mary White [R] |
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - SB 888 PN 1774, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - SB 888 PN 1774, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - SB 888 PN 1058, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - House - SB 888 PN 1774, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - SB 888 PN 1058, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Act No. 22 | |
2010-04-29 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-26 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-04-26 | Signed in House | |
2010-04-21 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Senate concurred in House amendments | |
2010-04-20 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-03-23 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-03-22 | Second consideration | |
2010-03-16 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-06-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-23 | Removed from table | |
2009-06-22 | Laid on the table | |
2009-06-22 | First consideration | |
2009-06-22 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-06-17 | In the House | |
2009-06-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-15 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |