PA SB881 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 30, 1981 (P.L.128, No.43), known as the Agricultural Area Security Law, further providing for purchase of agricultural conservation easements, for Agricultural Conservation Easement Purchase Fund and for Land Trust Reimbursement Program.
Title
Further providing for purchase of agricultural conservation easements, for Agricultural Conservation Easement Purchase Fund and for Land Trust Reimbursement Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 881 PN 1238, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-09-21 | House | In the House |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-1) |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-10-07 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |