PA SB850 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-19 - Governor's Line Item Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-19 - Governor's Line Item Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act to provide from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2009, to June 30, 2010, for certain institutions and organizations, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2009; to provide appropriations from the State Lottery Fund, the Energy Conservation and Assistance Fund, the Hazardous Material Response Fund, The State Stores Fund, the Milk Marketing Fund, the Home Investment Trust Fund, the Emergency Medical Services Operating Fund, the Tuition Payment Fund, the Banking Department Fund, the Firearm Records Check Fund, the Ben Franklin Technology Development Authority Fund and the Tobacco Settlement Fund to the Executive Department; to provide appropriations from the Judicial Computer System Augmentation Account to the Judicial Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2009, to June 30, 2010; to provide appropriations from the Motor License Fund for the fiscal year July 1, 2009, to June 30, 2010, for the proper operation of the several departments of the Commonwealth and the Pennsylvania State Police authorized to spend Motor License Fund moneys; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive Department of the Commonwealth and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2009; to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds from the General Fund, from the State Lottery Fund and from the Tobacco Settlement Fund for the Executive Department of the Commonwealth for the fiscal year July 1, 2008 to June 30, 2009, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2008; and making interfund transfers for the fiscal year July 1, 2008, to June 30, 2009.
Title
To provide from the General Fund for the expenses of the Executive, Legislative and Judicial Departments of the Commonwealth, the public debt and the public schools for the fiscal year July 1, 2009, to June 30, 2010, for certain institutions and organizations, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2009; to provide appropriations from the State Lottery Fund, the Energy Conservation and Assistance Fund, the Hazardous Material Response Fund, The State Stores Fund, the Milk Marketing Fund, the Home Investment Trust Fund, the Emergency Medical Services Operating Fund, the Tuition Payment Fund, the Banking Department Fund, the Firearm Records Check Fund, the Ben Franklin Technology Development Authority Fund and the Tobacco Settlement Fund to the Executive Department; to provide appropriations from the Judicial Computer System Augmentation Account to the Judicial Department for the fiscal year July 1, 2009, to June 30, 2010; to provide appropriations from the Motor License Fund for the fiscal year July 1, 2009, to June 30, 2010, for the proper operation of the several departments of the Commonwealth and the Pennsylvania State Police authorized to spend Motor License Fund moneys; to provide for the appropriation of Federal funds to the Executive Department of the Commonwealth and for the payment of bills remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2009; to provide for the additional appropriation of Federal and State funds from the General Fund, from the State Lottery Fund and from the Tobacco Settlement Fund for the Executive Department of the Commonwealth for the fiscal year July 1, 2008 to June 30, 2009, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2008; and making interfund transfers for the fiscal year July 1, 2008, to June 30, 2009.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-19 - Senate - SB 850 PN 953, GOVERNOR'S ITEM VETO MESSAGE OF SENATE BILL 850, PA. HOUSING FINANCE MORTGAGE ASST. PROGRAM HEMAP - $9,900,000 (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-04 - House - SB 850 PN 953, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-03 - House - SB 850 PN 953, AGREE TO ON, SECOND CONSIDERATION (Y: 187 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - SB 850 PN 953, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-04 - House - SB 850 PN 953, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-03 - House - SB 850 PN 953, AGREE TO ON, SECOND CONSIDERATION (Y: 187 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Senate - SB 850 PN 953, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-19 | Governor's Line Item Veto Message, laid on the table | |
2009-10-08 | Governor's Line Item Veto Message, removed from the table | |
2009-10-08 | Governor's Line Item Veto Message, laid on the table | |
2009-09-18 | Governor's Line Item Veto Message, removed from the table | |
2009-09-18 | Governor's Line Item Veto Message, laid on the table | |
2009-09-09 | All Motions to override Governor's Line Item Veto Message, in part, reconsidered | |
2010-12-31 | Motion to override Governor's Line Item Veto Message, in part, defeated, Aug. 19, 2009 | |
2010-12-31 | Motion to override Governor's Line Item Veto Message, in part, defeated, Aug. 19, 2009 | |
2010-12-31 | Motion to override Governor's Line Item Veto Message, in part, defeated, Aug. 19, 2009 | |
2010-12-31 | Motion to override Governor's Line Item Veto Message, in part, defeated, Aug. 19, 2009 | |
2010-12-31 | Motion to override Governor's Line Item Veto Message, in part, defeated, Aug. 19, 2009 | |
2010-12-31 | Motion to override Governor's Line Item Veto Message, in part, defeated, Aug. 19, 2009 | |
2009-08-19 | Governor's Line Item Veto Message, removed from the table | |
2009-08-10 | Bill, together with Governor's Line Item Veto Message, laid on the table | |
2009-08-05 | In the Senate | |
2009-08-05 | Act No. 1A | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor | |
2009-08-04 | Presented to the Governor | |
2009-08-04 | Signed in House | |
2009-08-04 | Signed in Senate | |
2009-08-04 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-12-31 | Second consideration, Aug. 3, 2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-13 | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill dropped from calendar | |
2009-07-13 | Laid on the table | |
2009-07-13 | First consideration | |
2009-07-13 | Reported as committed (with a negative recommendation) | |
2009-06-25 | Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-06 | In the House | |
2009-05-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-05 | Second consideration | |
2009-05-04 | First consideration | |
2009-05-04 | Reported as committed | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |