PA SB837 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 9, 1987 (P.L.220, No.39), known as the Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors Act, further providing for State Board of Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors, for restriction on the use of title "Licensed Marriage and Family Therapist" and for penalties.
Title
Further providing for State Board of Social Workers, Marriage and Family Therapists and Professional Counselors, for restriction on the use of title "Licensed Marriage and Family Therapist" and for penalties.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Rep. Matthew Smith [D] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] |
Sen. Vincent Hughes [D] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Floor: SB 837 PN 1671, FP (Y: 186 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 837 PN 1671, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Floor: SB 837 PN 1671, FP (Y: 186 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 837 PN 1671, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | House | Act No. 54 |
2016-06-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-14 | House | Signed in House |
2016-06-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (186-5) |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2016-05-18 | House | In the House |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |