PA SB826 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-16 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-16 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to Monroe County Municipal Waste Management Authority, or its successors or assigns, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Stroud Township, Monroe County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Military and Veterans Affairs and the Governor, to grant and convey to Monroe County Municipal Waste Management Authority, or its successors or assigns, certain lands, buildings and improvements situate in Stroud Township, Monroe County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 826 PN 1036, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-19 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-16 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-11-14 | House | In the House |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-09-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |