PA SB776 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in Dyslexia and Early Literacy Intervention Pilot Program, further providing for definitions and for establishment of program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions; and, in Dyslexia and Early Literacy Intervention Pilot Program, further providing for definitions and for establishment of program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 776 PN 1442, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-02HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2018-03-27HouseIn the House
2018-03-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2018-03-26SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-02-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-02-06SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-29SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-29SenateReported as amended
2017-06-16SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=776
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0776&pn=0973
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0776&pn=1442
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=01/29/2018&RollCallId=634
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=03/26/2018&RollCallId=729
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=442

Bill Comments

feedback