PA SB771 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-24 - Act No. 135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 8 (Boroughs and Incorporated Towns) and 11 (Cities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in powers and duties of elected officials, further providing for completion, filing and publication of auditor's report and financial statement; and, in accounts and finances, further providing for annual reports, publication, filing report with Department of Community and Economic Development and penalty.
Title
In powers and duties of elected officials, further providing for completion, filing and publication of auditor's report and financial statement; and, in accounts and finances, further providing for annual reports, publication, filing report with Department of Community and Economic Development and penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McGarrigle [R] | Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: SB 771 PN 969, FP (Y: 182 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 771 PN 969, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 771 PN 969, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-24 | House | Act No. 135 |
2018-10-24 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (182-0) |
2018-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2018-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-20 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-20 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-06 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-06-04 | House | In the House |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |