PA SB742 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for vehicle emissions modeling by Department of Transportation and for report to General Assembly.
Title
Providing for vehicle emissions modeling by Department of Transportation and for report to General Assembly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Floor: SB 742 PN 1429, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04124 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 742 PN 1060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - House - House Floor: SB 742 PN 1429, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A04124 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 742 PN 1060, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-01-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2020-01-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-18 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-12-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-25 | House | In the House |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (26-24) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |