PA SB734 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in tax credit eligibility, further providing for definitions and for eligibility and providing for application and administration, for assessment, for administering agency training, for broker registration, for tax credit and tax benefit reports, for allocation of tax credits or tax benefit program awarded upon appeal and for guidelines; in research and development tax credit, further providing for credit for research and development expenses, for carryover, carryback, refund and assignment of credit and for report to General Assembly; in keystone innovation zones, further providing for keystone innovation zone tax credits and for annual report; in procedure and administration, further providing for petition for reassessment, for petition procedure and for review by board; and making editorial changes.
Title
In tax credit eligibility, further providing for definitions and for eligibility and providing for application and administration, for assessment, for administering agency training, for broker registration, for tax credit and tax benefit reports, for allocation of tax credits or tax benefit program awarded upon appeal and for guidelines; in research and development tax credit, further providing for credit for research and development expenses, for carryover, carryback, refund and assignment of credit and for report to General Assembly; in keystone innovation zones, further providing for keystone innovation zone tax credits and for annual report; in procedure and administration, further providing for petition for reassessment, for petition procedure and for review by board; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |