PA SB731 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 152 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 152 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 16, 1996 (P.L.712, No.127), known as the Charitable Gift Annuity Exemption Act, further providing for definitions and for exemption from regulation.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for exemption from regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 731 PN 1169, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 731 PN 1169, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - House - House Floor: SB 731 PN 1169, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 731 PN 1169, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | House | Act No. 152 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-10-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-01-12 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-01-12 | House | Second consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | Removed from table |
2021-12-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-13 | House | First consideration |
2021-12-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-10-26 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2021-10-25 | House | In the House |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-2) |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2021-10-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |