PA SB725 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for Every Student Succeeds Act State plan review.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for Every Student Succeeds Act State plan review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-05-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |