PA SB699 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the disposition of certain lands situate in Plymouth Township, Luzerne County, subject to Project 70 restrictions.
Title
Authorizing the disposition of certain lands situate in Plymouth Township, Luzerne County, subject to Project 70 restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: SB 699 PN 683, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 699 PN 683, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: SB 699 PN 683, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 699 PN 683, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Act No. 14 |
2015-06-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2015-06-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Signed in House |
2015-06-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-06-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2015-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-16 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2015-06-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-05-06 | House | In the House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |