PA SB669 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal pensions, providing for pension service credit for prior service with police department.
Title
In municipal pensions, providing for pension service credit for prior service with police department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 669 PN 1674, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Adopt Amendment A04279 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Adopt Amendment A04279 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-06-15 | House | In the House |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-2) |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-05-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |