PA SB664 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, providing for extended special education enrollment due to COVID-19; and, in terms and courses of study, providing for optional year of education due to COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pupils and attendance, providing for extended special education enrollment due to COVID-19; and, in terms and courses of study, providing for optional year of education due to COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 664 PN 954, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 664 PN 954, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Floor: SB 664 PN 940, 2021 A1997, BENNINGHOFF (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 664 PN 815, 2021 A1614, SONNEY (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 664 PN 815, 2021 A1524, ISAACSON (Y: 100 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-06-22 - House - House Floor: SB 664 PN 815, 2021 A1447, SONNEY (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01166 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 664 PN 753, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateAct No. 66
2021-06-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-06-24SenateSigned in House
2021-06-24SenateSigned in Senate
2021-06-24SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (50-0)
2021-06-24SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-23SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2021-06-23SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-23HouseFinal passage (201-0)
2021-06-23HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2021-06-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-22HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-22HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-06-08HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-26HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-26HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-26HouseReported as amended
2021-05-17HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2021-05-12HouseIn the House
2021-05-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2021-05-12SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-05-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-11SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-05-10SenateFirst consideration
2021-05-10SenateReported as committed
2021-05-07SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=664
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0664&pn=0728
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0664&pn=0753
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0664&pn=0815
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0664&pn=0940
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0664&pn=0954
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/SB0664P0753.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/SB0664P0940.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=05/10/2021&RollCallId=174
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=109
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=05/12/2021&RollCallId=193
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/26/2021&RollCallId=499
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/26/2021&RollCallId=500
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=388
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=389
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=390
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/23/2021&RollCallId=764
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=411
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=412
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/24/2021&RollCallId=435
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=220

Bill Comments

feedback