PA SB64 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-14 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 30, 1981 (P.L.128, No.43), known as the Agricultural Area Security Law, further providing for purchase of agricultural conservation easements, for Agricultural Conservation Easement Purchase Fund and for Land Trust Reimbursement Program.
Title
Further providing for purchase of agricultural conservation easements, for Agricultural Conservation Easement Purchase Fund and for Land Trust Reimbursement Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Elder Vogel [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] | Sen. Kristin Phillips-Hill [R] |
Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Dave Arnold [R] | Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. Sharif Street [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04723 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 64 PN 40, Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A04723 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 64 PN 40, Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-14 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-14 | House | Second consideration |
2022-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2021-02-23 | House | In the House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (42-4) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-02-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |