PA SB595 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 52
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in casualty insurance, further providing for coverage for mammographic examinations.
Title
In casualty insurance, further providing for coverage for mammographic examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 595 PN 1722, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 595 PN 1722, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05961 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 595 PN 1396, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 595 PN 1722, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: SB 595 PN 1722, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A05961 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 595 PN 1396, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Act No. 52 |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2020-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2020-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-28 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |
2020-01-29 | House | In the House |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-09-23 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |