PA SB487 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-12 - Referred to COMMERCE
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-12 - Referred to COMMERCE
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 1989 (P.L.687, No.90), known as the Mortgage Bankers and Brokers and Consumer Equity Protection Act, further providing for definitions, for license requirements and exemptions, for application for license, for annual license fee, for issuance of license, for license duration, for licensee requirements, for licensee limitations, for authority of department or commission, for fees, for suspension, revocation or refusal, for penalties, for referral fees and for Real Estate Recovery Fund.
Title
An Act amending the act of December 22, 1989 (P.L.687, No.90), known as the Mortgage Bankers and Brokers and Consumer Equity Protection Act, further providing for definitions, for license requirements and exemptions, for application for license, for annual license fee, for issuance of license, for license duration, for licensee requirements, for licensee limitations, for authority of department or commission, for fees, for suspension, revocation or refusal, for penalties, for referral fees and for Real Estate Recovery Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Referred to COMMERCE | |
2008-03-11 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-03-10 | Second consideration | |
2008-02-11 | Re-reported as amended | |
2007-12-10 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-12-04 | First consideration | |
2007-12-04 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-15 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=487 |