PA SB459 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in employees, providing for use of force recordkeeping and reporting for law enforcement agencies.
Title
In employees, providing for use of force recordkeeping and reporting for law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 459 PN 1817, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 459 PN 1817, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2020-06-24 | House | In the House |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |